MA H3658 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3708
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a certain park in the town of Hingham as the Eugene F. Creedon memorial park. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating a certain park in the town of Hingham as the Eugene F. Creedon Memorial Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3708 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3708 (Replaced by) 2017-08-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2017
S22 (Similar To) 2017-06-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2017
H4082 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4298
S2582 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2018
H4842 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2582
S22 (Similar To) 2017-06-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2017
H4082 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4298
S2582 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2018
H4842 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2582
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3658 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3658.pdf |