MA H3652 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the submission of budget recommendations to the board of selectmen in the town of Arlington
Title
Relative to budget submissions to the town manager in the town of Arlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-11-28 | House | Enacted |
2011-11-23 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-11-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-08-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-08-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3652 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17108&generalCourtId=1 |