MA H3650 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the incorporation of the Greater Haverhill Foundation. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the Greater Haverhill Foundation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-12-19 | House | Enacted |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-28 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-10-24 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-10-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-09-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2013-08-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3650 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3650.pdf |