MA H3646 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Worcester Regional Retirement System to grant creditable service to Nelson Burlingame. Public Service.
Title
Directing the Worcester Regional Retirement System to grant creditable service to Nelson Burlingame
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-06-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-05-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4494 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4494 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3646 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3646.pdf |