MA H3644 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Bedford be authorized to release a portion of a certain conservation restriction in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Bedford to release a portion of a certain conservation restriction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-22 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 82 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #83 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #83 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-31 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #83 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2019-07-22 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 82) |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-06-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H2649 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2222 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3865 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
S2279 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2019
S2222 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3865 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
S2279 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2019