MA H3643 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the hiring of veterans for state park ranger positions. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the hiring of veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D] | Rep. Kate Hogan [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] |
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/17 from 2:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 & B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1938 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H214 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H1945 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1946 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1569 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2242 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3643 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3643.pdf |