MA H3639 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Capano of Lynn, a petition of Peter Capano that the Massachusetts Teachers’ Retirement Board be authorized to credit Cheryl DiLisio, an employee of Nahant public schools, with certain creditable service. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting creditable service to Cheryl DiLisio, an employee of Nahant public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2023-04-04JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-03-30SenateSenate concurred
2023-03-30HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback