MA H3637 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate a portion of Route 9 as the Marine Corps League highway. Transportation.
Title
Designating that portion of Route 9 from the city of Northampton to the city of Pittsfield as the marine corps league highway
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2012-12-28 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-12-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-11-21 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-11-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-14 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-06-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3637 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15155&generalCourtId=1 |