MA H3635 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4460
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4460
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to rent regulation in governmentally-involved housing in the city of Boston. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To restore Boston’s governmentally-involved housing protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4460 |
2012-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2012 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-07-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4460 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3635 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17163&generalCourtId=1 |