MA H3621 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the suspension or revocation of motor vehicle licenses for the failure to pay municipal fines. Transportation.
Title
Relative to civil fine enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4944 |
2022-01-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H361 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S234 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3430 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H361 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S234 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4944 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3621 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3621.pdf |