MA H3621 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of said city. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the charter of the city known as the town of Amesbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-12-15 | House | Enacted |
2011-12-12 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2011-12-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2086 |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Read third |
2011-12-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-26 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2011-09-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-09-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-09-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-09-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-25 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3621 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17182&generalCourtId=1 |