MA H3607 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Lewis of Winchester, a petition of Frank I. Smizik, William N. Brownsberger and Carolyn C. Dykema for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) to identify opportunities to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of state agencies, programs and services. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing a special commission to identify opportunities to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of state agencies, programs and services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-30 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-03-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint committee on Rules |
2012-02-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Weymouth Town Hall |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3607 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14877&generalCourtId=1 |