MA H3603 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3472
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Fairhaven to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Fairhaven to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-18 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 107 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-10-09 | House | Enacted |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-08-26 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-08-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-08-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-07-30 | House | New draft of H3472 |
2013-07-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3472 (Replaces) 2013-08-12 - Accompanied H3603
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3603 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3603.pdf |