MA H3602 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the prevention of wrong-way driving. Transportation.
Title
Relative to wrong-way driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-01-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3455 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3496
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
S1574 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3602 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3602.pdf |