MA H3595 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote employment for people with disabilities by establishing a council for purchasing from persons with disabilities. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To promote employment for people with disabilities
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-03-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3595 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14353&generalCourtId=1 |