MA H3589 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Phyllis A. Rugnetta, an employee of the Department of Health and Human Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Grace A. Rugnetta, an employee of the Executive Office of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H3640 |
2011-07-28 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2011-07-28 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2011-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2011-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3589 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16979&generalCourtId=1 |