MA H3573 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 84-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to introductory and in-service training programs of law enforcement agencies in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect the civil rights and safety of all Massachusetts residents

Sponsors

Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Michael Moran [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Jose Tosado [D]
Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2060 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S1307 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1560 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S907 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1586 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback