MA H3568 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H122
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers.
Title
Increasing the experience and background necessary to operate low pressure processed steam boilers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-10-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-02-09 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security with the amendment pending |
2012-01-12 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-01-12 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title (H3876) |
2011-07-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-07-06 | House | New draft of H122 |
2011-07-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H122 (Replaces) 2011-07-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3568