MA H3566 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to certain court records in eviction actions. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting housing opportunity and mobility through eviction sealing (HOMES)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S850 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
H3275 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S854 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3378 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback