MA H3547 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S917
Note: Legislation replaced by H3711
Note: Legislation replaced by H3711
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-30 - New draft substituted, see H3711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-30 - New draft substituted, see H3711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emergency scheduling of addictive substances by the Commissioner of Public Health
Title
Relative to emergency scheduling of addictive substances by the Commissioner of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-30 | House | New draft substituted, see H3711 |
2013-10-30 | House | Read second, amendment (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing) adopted |
2013-10-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2013-10-24 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment previously recommended pending |
2013-10-24 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3711 |
2013-07-11 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-11 | House | New draft of S917 |
2013-07-11 | House | Reported from the committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S917 (Replaces) 2013-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3547
H3711 (Replaced by) 2014-05-08 - Accompanied S1965
H3711 (Replaced by) 2014-05-08 - Accompanied S1965
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3547 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3547.pdf |