MA H3542 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3757
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3757
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3757
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to issue 12 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises and 3 additional licenses for the sale of wines and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Boston to grant 15 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3757 |
2017-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H394 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H2923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2142 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H389 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H3757 (Replaced by) 2017-08-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H3749 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2017
H4073 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2018
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
H397 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2908 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H2923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2142 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
H389 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H410 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H3757 (Replaced by) 2017-08-28 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H3727 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2017
S1775 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3921 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4005
H3749 (Similar To) 2017-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2017
H4073 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2018
H4086 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4927
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3542 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3542.pdf |