MA H3536 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4403
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect consumers using the Internet from identity theft and online predators. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to identity theft and online predators on the Internet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4403 |
2012-02-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/15/2012 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4403 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3536 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13731&generalCourtId=1 |