MA H3524 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the position of chief of the police department of the town of Tyringham from provisions of the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Tyringham to continue the employment of the Chief of Police, Peter Curtin
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 150 of the Acts of 2012 |
2012-07-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-07-11 | House | Enacted |
2012-07-09 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2012-07-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-06-11 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-06-05 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2012-06-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day, the question being on engrossment |
2012-05-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-12-22 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Public Service |
2011-12-22 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2011-12-22 | House | Read third |
2011-12-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3524 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17014&generalCourtId=1 |