MA H3523 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - New draft substituted, see H3853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - New draft substituted, see H3853
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the procurement and award of contracts for the construction, reconstruction, installation, demolition, maintenance or repair of buildings by public agencies in the city of Boston
Title
PETITION FOR A SPECIAL LAW RE: THE PROCUREMENT AND AWARD OF CONTRACTS FOR CERTAIN AFFORDABLE HOUSING IN THE CITY OF BOSTON
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | House | New draft substituted, see H3853 |
2012-01-09 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means) |
2012-01-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-01-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2011-12-22 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment (H3853) pending |
2011-10-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2011-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3853 (Replaced by) 2012-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3523 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16997&generalCourtId=1 |