MA H3521 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate civil service exams. Public Service.
Title
To reform civil service exams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-11-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H887 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H200 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S99 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H887 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H200 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H744 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S99 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3521.pdf |