MA H3503 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3664
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-14)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the issuance of "Boston Strong" motor vehicle registration plates. Transportation.
Title
Relative to a Massachusetts Boston Strong license plate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3664 |
2013-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3664 (Replaced by) 2014-04-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3503 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3503.pdf |