MA H3503 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the capital outlay provisions of the charter of the town of Harwich
Title
Relative to the Charter of the Town of Harwich
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 103 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-02-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-12-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-12-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-12-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-11-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2011 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-06-15 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3503 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17012&generalCourtId=1 |