MA H3500 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to titles for real estate. The Judiciary.
Title
Protecting titles to real estate in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S795 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S102 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
S104 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2246
H1575 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S102 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
S104 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2246
H1575 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3500.pdf |