MA H3496 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing increased fees for special details performed by public employees in the city of Melrose By Representative Brodeur of Melrose and Senator Clark, a joint petition of Paul Brodeur, Katherine M. Clark and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Melrose be authorized to increase fees for special details performed by municipal employees of said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing increased fees for special details performed by public employees in the city of Melrose
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-07-30 | House | Enacted |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-07-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-07-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-06-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-06-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-06-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3496 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3496.pdf |