MA H3492 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3464
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents
Title
Financing the production and preservation of housing for low and moderate income residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #205 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2013-11-06 | House | Enacted 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 244) |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-11-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-10-30 | House | Reported by H3727 |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Brewer-Eldridge-Tarr), in concurrence |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2013-08-08 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Dempsey-Honan-Smola) |
2013-08-08 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #150 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Read third |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S1835, amended |
2013-07-25 | Senate | For actions, see S1835 |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Read second |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 25, 2013 |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-07-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1835 |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1829 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-06-05 | House | Passed to be engrossed 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 126) |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 16 adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 7 adopted 123 YEAS to 27 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 125) |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 13 adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 15 rejected |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 5 adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 6 adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 14 rejected |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 4 rejected 43 YEAS to 107 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 124) |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 3 rejected 48 YEAS to 102 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 123) |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 2 rejected 51 YEAS to 98 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 122) |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment 1 rejected 27 YEAS to 124 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 121) |
2013-06-05 | House | Read third |
2013-06-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-05 | House | New draft of H3464 |
2013-06-05 | House | Recommended new draft of H3464 |
2013-06-05 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3464 (Replaces) 2013-06-05 - New draft substituted, see H3492
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3492 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3492.pdf |