MA H3492 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S66
Note: Replaces legislation H1294
Note: Replaces legislation H1294
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - New draft substituted as amended, see S1963
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - New draft substituted as amended, see S1963
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding families and children engaged in services.
Title
Regarding families and children engaged in services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Senate | New draft substituted as amended, see S1963 |
2011-07-14 | Senate | Read second |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2011-07-12 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S1963 |
2011-06-16 | House | House concurred |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-06-09 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-06-09 | House | New draft of S66 and H1294 |
2011-06-09 | House | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S66 (Replaces) 2011-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H1294 (Replaces) 2011-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3492
H1294 (Replaces) 2011-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3492