MA H3489 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid fees. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to Medicaid fees
Sponsors
Rep. James Lyons [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-04-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H218 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H213 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1661 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1338 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1339 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1165 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H213 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
H880 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H925 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1728 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1301 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1661 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H979 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
S2337 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2436
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3489 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3489.pdf |