MA H3480 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S227
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S227
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. McMurtry of Dedham, a petition of Paul McMurtry and others for an investigation by a special commission (including members of the General Court) of the start and end times for school days at public elementary and secondary schools. Education.
Title
Encouraging academic success
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Accompanied S227 |
2017-08-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/05/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S227 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1439 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2113 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S2128
S2128 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
S2343 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2374
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S227 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3480 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3480.pdf |