MA H3478 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the terms of office of city councilors in the city of Springfield. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for the term of office of the City Council in the city of Springfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2013 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3478 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3478.pdf |