MA H3474 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Stow to amend a certain conservation restriction to allow for the construction of a water supply well. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to a conservation restriction in the town of Stow
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-29 | House | Again enacted |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Senate receded from its amendment |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-24 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-07-24 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-03-20 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-08-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-06-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-06-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2013-05-17 | House | Returned by the Secretary of State |
2013-03-14 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3474 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3474.pdf |