MA H346 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4659
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the establishment of senior citizen safety zones in cities and towns. Elder Affairs.
Title
Authorizing the establishment of senior citizen safety zones
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4659 |
2017-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S359 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4659 (Replaced by) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H346 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H346.pdf |