MA H3446 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish a sick leave bank for Michael Jordan, an employee of the department of the Trial Court
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Michael Jordan, an employee of the of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-10-03 | House | Enacted |
2011-10-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-10-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-09-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-08-11 | House | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-08-08 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2011-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to the House committee on Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3446 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15052&generalCourtId=1 |