MA H3441 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4364
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing law enforcement with tools to prevent youth violence
Title
To provide law enforcement with tools to prevent youth violence
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-31 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4364 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-30 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 8, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 27, 2012 |
2011-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2011 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4364 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3441 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=16083&generalCourtId=1 |