MA H3430 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4467

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Smizik of Brookline, a petition of Frank I. Smizik, Cynthia S. Creem and Michael J. Moran (by vote of the town) that the town of Brookline be authorized to grant certain local voting rights for permanent legal resident aliens residing in said town. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing certain local voting rights for permanent legal resident aliens residing in the Town of Brookline

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4467
2011-10-20JointHearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2011-05-09SenateSenate concurred
2011-05-05HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H4467 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback