MA H3423 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4711
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4711
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to MassHealth benefits for single individuals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to MassHealth benefits for single individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4711 |
2016-10-17 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Health Care Financing |
2016-10-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-10-17 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4711 (Replaced by) 2016-10-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1512 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1513 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3051 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2640 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4213
H2161 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3423 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3423.pdf |