MA H3414 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Hearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to vehicle registrations for certain recreation vehicles at sanctioned races, rallies or events. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Chapter 90B

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23JointHearing scheduled for 11/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3572 (Similar To) 2021-09-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4113
S2389 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
S2338 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback