MA H3412 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of class 1 dealers' licenses. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the issuance of a class 1 dealer license
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2017-11-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/17 from 3:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1979 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
S1982 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - New draft substituted, see S2269
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
S2269 (Similar To) 2018-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2018
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1982 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - New draft substituted, see S2269
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
S2269 (Similar To) 2018-10-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 276 of the Acts of 2018
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3412 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3412.pdf |