MA H3410 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Blais of Sunderland, a petition of Natalie M. Blais and David Allen Robertson that certain commercial motor vehicles combined with a trailer with a total weight equal to or less than 99,000 be authorized to travel on certain public ways with permits. Transportation.
Title
Relative to certain truck transportation practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2286 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S226 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S226 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3410 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3410.pdf |