MA H341 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4630
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4630
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish pilot programs for universal pre-kindergarten in gateway municipalities and other low-income neighborhoods and communities. Education.
Title
To establish pilot programs and subsequent study for universal pre-kindergarten
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4630 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 17, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, April 15, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4630 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H828 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H339 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H1922 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1256 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H828 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H339 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H1922 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H3501 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1256 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H341.pdf |