MA H3407 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4649
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt disabled veterans from motor vehicle registration fees on primary passenger vehicles. Transportation.
Title
To waive motor vehicle registration fees on a primary passenger vehicle for disabled veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Bradford Hill [R] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4649 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1500 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3353 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1935 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1471 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3353 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1935 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H1471 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H4649 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3407 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3407.pdf |