MA H3391 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide an income tax credit for child care expenses. Revenue.
Title
Establishing a child care tax credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-04-19 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3391 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14632&generalCourtId=1 |