MA H3387 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4179
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require that a “Proudly Made in Massachusetts” logo be included in screen credits for movies filmed in the Commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Requiring a "Proudly Made in Massachusetts" logo to be included in on screen credits for movies filmed in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4179 |
2015-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4179 (Replaced by) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3387 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3387.pdf |