MA H3375 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3322
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the sale of all alcoholic beverages in certain establishments in the town of Stoneham
Title
Relative to the sale of all alcoholic beverages in certain establishments in the town of Stoneham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-12-28 | House | Enacted |
2015-12-24 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-12-24 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-09-24 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-05-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-05-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-05-18 | House | New draft of H3322 |
2015-05-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3322 (Replaces) 2015-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3375
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3375 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3375.pdf |