MA H3368 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate "Here's to America" as the official patriotic song of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing "Here's to America" as the official patriotic song of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-04-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3368 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3368.pdf |