MA H3367 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to reduce health care costs by promoting additional education on cost effectiveness to providers. Public Health.
Title
To reduce healthcare costs by promoting provider education through academic detailing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-06-18 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2012-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-03-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3367 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13446&generalCourtId=1 |